Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Conrad Gröber

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1872Born
15 Aug 189725.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Oct 189725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
13 Jan 193158.7AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
1 Feb 193158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
15 Feb 193158.8InstalledBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
21 May 193260.1AppointedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
20 Jun 193260.2InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
14 Feb 194875.8DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Conrad Gröber
Archbishop Conrad Gröber (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMesskirch

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018