Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Stohr

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1890Born
19 Oct 191322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
10 Jun 193544.5SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
17 Jul 193544.6ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
24 Aug 193544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
3 Jun 196170.5DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert Stohr
Bishop Albert Stohr (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFriedberg

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018