Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Fritz

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1864BornAdelhausen
12 Jul 188823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
6 Sep 192056.0SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 Oct 192056.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Oct 192056.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Dec 193167.3DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Fritz:
Archbishop Karl Fritz (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013