Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Nörber

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1846Born
24 Jul 187023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
2 Aug 189851.6SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
5 Sep 189851.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Sep 189851.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
27 Jul 192073.6DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nörber (VIAF: 42650104)
Archbishop Thomas Nörber (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaldstetten, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freiburg, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017