Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kazimierz Jan Majdański

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1916BornMalgów
29 Jul 194529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Nov 196246.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Nov 196246.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zorolus
24 Mar 196347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zorolus
1 Mar 197963.0AppointedBishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
19 Jan 198063.9AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
198164.8ResignedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
25 Mar 199276.1RetiredBishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
25 Mar 199276.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
29 Apr 200791.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Jan Majdański:
Archbishop Kazimierz Jan Majdański (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ab/vprs/xfam: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 108
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 12 Dec 2014