Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Salezy Korszyński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Orisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1893Born
25 Jul 191522.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 194653.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
7 May 194653.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Orisa
29 Jun 194653.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orisa
3 Nov 196269.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Salezy Korszyński
Bishop Franciszek Salezy Korszyński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReczno

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/ob: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast