Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiesław Szlachetka

Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk

Titular Bishop of Vageata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1959 BornMała Komorza
20 Jun 198525.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 May 198626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 Mar 199232.3IncardinatedPriest of Gdańsk, Poland
21 Dec 201354.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
21 Dec 201354.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vageata
4 Jan 201454.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vageata

MicroData Summary for Wiesław Szlachetka:
Bishop Wiesław Szlachetka (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Gdańsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • c1+: CB, 4 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014