Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angel Pérez Cisneros

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1911BornTurmero
1 Jul 193725.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 196048.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
25 Jul 196048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
18 Jun 196957.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
18 Jun 196957.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Castello
30 Aug 197260.9SucceededArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
20 Aug 197967.9ResignedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
26 Nov 198776.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Angel Pérez Cisneros:
Archbishop Angel Pérez Cisneros (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013