Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Acacio Chacón Guerra

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1884Born
1 Nov 190723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
10 May 192641.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
10 May 192641.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Milevum
29 Aug 192642.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Milevum
1 Aug 192743.1SucceededArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Dec 196682.5RetiredArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Dec 196682.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scebatiana
19 Jan 197186.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Scebatiana
2 Mar 197893.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Acacio Chacón Guerra
Archbishop Acacio Chacón Guerra (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLobatera

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 51.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast