Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ramón Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1850Born
21 Sep 187323.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 189443.9AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
13 Jan 189544.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
11 Jun 192372.9AppointedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
1 Aug 192777.0DiedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ramón Silva (VIAF: 169543589)
Archbishop Antonio Ramón Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017