Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rincón Bonilla

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Tamasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1915BornTáriba
23 Mar 194025.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 195035.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zulia, Venezuela
9 Dec 195035.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
22 Apr 195136.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
1961²45.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
14 May 198469.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Rincón Bonilla:
Bishop José Rincón Bonilla (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013