Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frédéric-Henri Oury

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1842Born
23 Sep 186523.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 188542.7SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
27 Mar 188542.8ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
21 Jun 188543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
2 Mar 188643.8SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
10 Jun 188644.1ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
16 Sep 188644.3InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
3 Jun 189048.0SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
26 Jun 189048.1ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
8 Jul 189856.1SelectedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
28 Nov 189856.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
15 Dec 190765.6ResignedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
29 Apr 190966.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
6 Feb 192178.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Frédéric-Henri Oury (VIAF: 49239241)
Archbishop Frédéric-Henri Oury (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVêndôme, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Le Mans, Diocese of Le Mans, France

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 89, and Page 248
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274, and Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017