Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Victor-Emile Bougaud

Deceased

Bishop of Laval, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1823Born
6 Jun 184623.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 188764.7SelectedBishop of Laval, France
25 Nov 188764.7ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
3 Feb 188864.9Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
7 Nov 188865.6DiedBishop of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Victor-Emile Bougaud (VIAF: 46799454)
Bishop Louis-Victor-Emile Bougaud (born , died ) Bishop of Laval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon, Diocese of Dijon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Orléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 580
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017