Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume-Marie-Joseph Cardinal Labouré

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1841Born
23 Sep 186523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
31 Jan 188543.2SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
27 Mar 188543.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
31 May 188543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
13 Jun 189351.6SelectedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
15 Jun 189351.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
19 Apr 189755.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 189856.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
21 Apr 190664.4DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Marie-Joseph Labouré (VIAF: 44613769)
Guillaume-Marie-Joseph Cardinal Labouré (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAchiet-le-Petit, Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)
Ordained BishopInstitution Richelieu, Luçon, Diocese of Luçon
Death PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195, and Page 478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1897
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017