Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Thomas Sheridan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Cursola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1922BornNew York
1 Mar 194724.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 199068.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 199068.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
12 Dec 199068.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola
15 Jan 200178.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
2 Dec 201189.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Thomas Sheridan:
Bishop Patrick Joseph Thomas Sheridan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,193
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015