Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Charles Bambera

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1956 Born
14 May 198327.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Nov 198327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Feb 201053.9AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Apr 201054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Charles Bambera
Bishop Joseph Charles Bambera (born ) Bishop of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarbondale, PA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Scranton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast