Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Anthony Brucato

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Temuniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1931Born
1 Jun 195725.7Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Jun 199765.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
30 Jun 199765.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Temuniana
25 Aug 199766.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temuniana
31 Oct 200675.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
7 Nov 201887.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Anthony Brucato
Bishop Robert Anthony Brucato (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceYonkers, NY
Buried Place (Original)Gate of Heaven, Cemetery, Valhalla, NY

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,037
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 7 Nov 2018
  • 23.loc: CB, 8 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast