Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred James Jolson, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Reykjavik, Iceland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1928Born
14 Jun 195829.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 198759.4AppointedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
6 Feb 198859.6Ordained BishopBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland
21 Mar 199465.7DiedBishop of Reykjavik, Iceland

MicroData Summary for Alfred James Jolson
Bishop Alfred James Jolson S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Reykjavik

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBridgeport, CT, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
Ordained BishopKrists Konungs, Cathedral, Reykjavik, Diocese of Reykjavik
Death PlacePittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,434
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,802
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast