Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edward Michael Cardinal Egan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1932Born
15 Dec 195725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
1 Apr 198552.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
1 Apr 198552.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Allegheny
22 May 198553.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Allegheny
5 Nov 198856.5AppointedBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
14 Dec 198856.6InstalledBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
11 May 200068.1AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Jun 200068.2InstalledArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
21 Feb 200168.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200168.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
23 Feb 200168.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
23 Feb 200976.8RetiredArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
5 Mar 201582.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Michael Egan
Edward Michael Cardinal Egan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOak Park, IL

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2009
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 May 2017