Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund James Whalen

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Cemerinianus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1958 Born
14 Apr 198324.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of New York, New York, USA
23 Jun 198425.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
10 Oct 201961.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
10 Oct 201961.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
10 Dec 201961.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus

MicroData Summary for Edmund James Whalen
Bishop Edmund James Whalen (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStaten Island, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick’s, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick’s, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2019
  • mn/ob/c12/od: CB, 10 Oct 2019
  • c34: CB, 28 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast