Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Francis McCarthy

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Verrona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1942 BornMount Kisco
1 Jun 196825.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
11 May 199956.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
11 May 199956.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Verrona
29 Jun 199957.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verrona
15 Jun 200259.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Francis McCarthy:
Bishop James Francis McCarthy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,573
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013