Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier Nuño y Guerrero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1905Born
7 Apr 192822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
10 Jul 195145.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Zacatecas, México
10 Jul 195145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Syedra
15 Aug 195145.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syedra
5 Dec 195146.0SucceededBishop of Zacatecas, México
18 Dec 195449.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Dec 195449.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garella
10 Apr 195549.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
25 Mar 197266.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
29 Jun 197266.5InstalledBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
10 Jan 198175.1RetiredBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
1 Dec 198377.9DiedBishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Nuño y Guerrero
Archbishop Francisco Javier Nuño y Guerrero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast