Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Guadalupe Padilla Lozano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1920Born
20 Apr 194625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Jan 196342.0AppointedBishop of Veracruz, México
19 Mar 196342.2Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz, México
18 Feb 200079.1RetiredBishop of Veracruz, México
8 Sep 201392.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for José Guadalupe Padilla Lozano
Bishop José Guadalupe Padilla Lozano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Veracruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel el Alto

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: CB, 8 Sep 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast