Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio de Alba y Hernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Colima, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1890Born
28 Oct 191524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
29 Apr 193948.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Colima, México
29 Apr 193948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Algiza
28 May 193948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Algiza
30 Jun 194958.6SucceededBishop of Colima, México
25 Jul 196776.7RetiredBishop of Colima, México
25 Jul 196776.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
18 Jan 197685.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
26 May 197887.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for Ignacio de Alba y Hernández
Bishop Ignacio de Alba y Hernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Colima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de los Lagos

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast