Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel González Ibarra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1918BornS. Pedro Tlaquepaque
31 Mar 194526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
20 Mar 196142.5AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
28 May 196142.7Ordained BishopBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
15 Jul 196748.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
14 Nov 198163.1ResignedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
11 Aug 199172.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel González Ibarra:
Bishop Miguel González Ibarra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Obregón

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013