Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José del Pilar Quezada Valdéz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acapulco, Guerrero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1900BornTeocaltiche
21 Dec 192323.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 195858.2AppointedBishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
25 Jan 195958.3Ordained BishopBishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
1 Jun 197675.6RetiredBishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
25 Nov 198585.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Acapulco, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for José del Pilar Quezada Valdéz:
Bishop José del Pilar Quezada Valdéz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acapulco

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013