Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Muñoz Núñez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1925BornVista Hermosa
24 Mar 195126.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 197247.5AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
29 Sep 197247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecas, México
1 Jun 198459.4AppointedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
18 May 199873.3ResignedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
19 Feb 201085.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Muñoz Núñez:
Bishop Rafael Muñoz Núñez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aguascalientes

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013