Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Piña Torres

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit, México

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1910Born
31 Mar 193423.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 195847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
12 May 195847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
15 Aug 195847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
16 May 197059.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
7 Jul 199786.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Piña Torres
Bishop José Manuel Piña Torres (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tepic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Roble

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast