Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Aguirre Franco

Archbishop Emeritus of Acapulco, Guerrero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1934 BornEncarnación de Díaz
22 Mar 195824.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 197440.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
12 Mar 197440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Otriculum
25 Apr 197440.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Otriculum
28 Apr 198854.2AppointedBishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
30 Jun 200066.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
8 May 200167.3SucceededArchbishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
7 Jun 201076.3RetiredArchbishop of Acapulco, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Felipe Aguirre Franco:
Archbishop Felipe Aguirre Franco (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Acapulco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Acapulco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013