Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Quintero Arce

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo, Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1920Born
8 Apr 194424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
20 Mar 196141.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
14 May 196141.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
3 Mar 196646.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
3 Mar 196646.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thysdrus
17 Jun 196646.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
18 Aug 196848.5SucceededArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
20 Aug 199676.5RetiredArchbishop of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
15 Feb 201696.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Carlos Quintero Arce
Archbishop Carlos Quintero Arce (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtzatlán

  • a priest for 71.8 years
  • a bishop for 54.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast