Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Romero Arvizu, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1919BornEtzatlán
24 Jun 194526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 May 196243.1AppointedPrelate of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México
24 May 196243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
15 Aug 196243.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa
15 Feb 197858.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Dusa
27 Jun 199273.2ResignedPrelate of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México
6 Nov 200990.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Romero Arvizu:
Bishop Manuel Romero Arvizu O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Jesús María (del Nayar)

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 119
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013