Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Trinidad Sepúlveda Ruiz-Velasco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1921Born
27 Mar 194826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
20 May 196544.1AppointedBishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
25 Jul 196544.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
12 Feb 198866.8AppointedBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
11 Mar 198866.9InstalledBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
20 Jan 199977.8RetiredBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
4 Sep 201796.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José Trinidad Sepúlveda Ruiz-Velasco (VIAF: 4354800)
Bishop José Trinidad Sepúlveda Ruiz-Velasco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtotonilco El Alto
Death PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 52.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Sep 2017