Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfons Nossol

Bishop Emeritus of Opole, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1932 Born
23 Jun 195724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
25 Jun 197744.8AppointedBishop of Opole, Poland
17 Aug 197745.0Ordained BishopBishop of Opole, Poland
12 Nov 199967.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Opole, Poland
14 Aug 200977.0RetiredBishop of Opole, Poland

MicroData Summary
Alfons Nossol
Archbishop Alfons Nossol
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Opole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrozec
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Opole, Diocese of Opole

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Opole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2009
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,065
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025