Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Pierskała

Auxiliary Bishop of Opole

Titular Bishop of Semina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1959 BornKędzierzyn-Koźle
22 Jun 198525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
7 Dec 201354.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
7 Dec 201354.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Semina
11 Jan 201454.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semina

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Pierskała:
Bishop Rudolf Pierskała (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Opole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Opole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 9 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014