Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Walter Yanta

Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1931 Born
17 Mar 195624.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Oct 199463.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Oct 199463.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
30 Dec 199463.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
21 Jan 199765.3AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
17 Mar 199765.4InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
3 Jan 200876.2RetiredBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Walter Yanta (VIAF: 19060643)
Bishop John Walter Yanta (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRunge

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amarillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,455
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast