Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Adamiuk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Opole, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ala Miliaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1913Born
18 Jun 193925.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197056.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
6 Jun 197056.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ala Miliaria
5 Jul 197056.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ala Miliaria
2 Sep 198975.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
25 Jan 200086.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Opole, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Adamiuk (VIAF: 173714001)
Bishop Antoni Adamiuk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Opole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOld Forge, PA, USA
Ordained BishopSainte Croix, Cathedral, Opole, Diocese of Opole

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 621

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast