Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Marie Albert Froment

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1928BornMaleville
29 Jun 195224.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 198557.3AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
15 Sep 198557.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
22 Oct 199668.7ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
9 Feb 2006³78.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roger Marie Albert Froment:
Bishop Roger Marie Albert Froment (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013