Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Wejman

Auxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień

Titular Bishop of Sinitis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1959 BornChoszczno
15 Apr 198424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
22 Nov 201454.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
22 Nov 201454.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
20 Dec 201455.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis

MicroData Summary for Henryk Wejman:
Bishop Henryk Wejman (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Szczecin-Kamień.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2014
  • c2: CB, 7 Dec 2014
  • c34: CB, 11 Dec 2014
  • bp: CB, 23 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015