Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile-Marie Louvard

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1858BornRadon
3 Jun 188223.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 191960.4AppointedBishop of Langres, France
1 May 191960.6Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
22 May 191960.6InstalledBishop of Langres, France
31 Oct 192466.1AppointedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
28 Jan 192566.3InstalledBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
8 Apr 195091.5DiedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary for Théophile-Marie Louvard:
Bishop Théophile-Marie Louvard (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013