Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octave-Louis Pasquet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sées

Titular Bishop of Eriza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1869BornPercy
23 Dec 189324.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192656.6AppointedBishop of Sées, France
8 Sep 192656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sées, France
31 Mar 196191.4RetiredBishop of Sées, France
31 Mar 196191.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eriza
11 Jul 196191.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Sées, France

MicroData Summary for Octave-Louis Pasquet:
Bishop Octave-Louis Pasquet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sées

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013