Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Léon Louis Caillot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1908Born
29 Jun 193224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances (-Avranches), France
12 Dec 196153.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Evreux, France
12 Dec 196153.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
26 Mar 196254.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia
24 Mar 196456.0SucceededBishop of Evreux, France
12 Apr 197264.0ResignedBishop of Evreux, France
5 Feb 199485.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Léon Louis Caillot
Bishop Antoine Léon Louis Caillot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValognes

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast