Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Flocard

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1866BornJorquenay
15 Jun 188923.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192054.6AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
25 Jan 192154.7Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
3 Mar 193871.8DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred Flocard:
Bishop Alfred Flocard (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015