Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Nguyên Khác Ngu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1909Born
29 Jun 193425.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 196051.8AppointedBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
22 Jan 196151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
30 Dec 199788.9RetiredBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
10 Jun 2009100.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Michel Nguyên Khác Ngu
Bishop Michel Nguyên Khác Ngu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVan Dôn

  • a priest for 74.9 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast