Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Nguyên Van Binh

Deceased

Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1910Born
27 Mar 193726.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 195545.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cân Tho, Viet Nam
20 Sep 195545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Agnus
30 Nov 195545.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agnus
24 Nov 196050.2AppointedArchbishop of Saigon, Viet Nam
1 Jul 199584.8DiedArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyên Van Binh
Archbishop Paul Nguyên Van Binh (born , died ) Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThành-Phô Hô Chí Minh

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast