Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Nguyên Van Thien

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Hispellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1906Born
20 Feb 193225.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 196054.6AppointedBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
22 Jan 196154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
12 Jul 196862.3ResignedBishop of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam
12 Jul 196862.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hispellum
13 May 2012106.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Antoine Nguyên Van Thien
Bishop Antoine Nguyên Van Thien (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vĩnh Long

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCai Côn

  • a priest for 80.2 years
  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 14 May 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast