Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Nguyên-Kim-Diên

Deceased

Archbishop of Huế, Viet Nam

Note/Previous Titular See: (Petits Freres de Jesus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1921Born
21 Jul 194726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Other
24 Nov 196039.6AppointedBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
22 Jan 196139.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
30 Sep 196443.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
30 Sep 196443.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
11 Mar 196846.9SucceededArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
8 Jun 198867.2DiedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Philippe Nguyên-Kim-Diên
Archbishop Philippe Nguyên-Kim-Diên (born , died ) Archbishop of Huế

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLong-Duc

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast