Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Dioecesis Coslinensis-Colubregana



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Zbigniew Jan Zieliński, Bishop
  • Krzysztof Zadarko, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edward Dajczak, Bishop Emeritus
  • Paweł Cieślik, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 June 1972
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Szczecin-Kamień
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 14,640 (5,654 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.koszalin.opoka.org.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Biskupia, ul. Ksiedza Kardynala Stefana Wyszynskiego 25, 75-062 Koszalin, Polska
  • Telephone: (094)343.87.10
  • Fax: 343.87.39

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 June 1972ErectedDiocese of Berlin
Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl (suppressed)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (erected) (Koszalin, Lebork, and Kostkowo and Wierzchucino (in Gdįnsk))
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm) (Brusy, Chojnice, Czersk, Gniew, Kamień Krajeński, Kartuzy, Koronowo, Kościerzyna, Nowe, Osiek, Sierakowice, Skarszewy, Starogard Gdański, Świecie I, Świecie II, Tczew, Tuchola, Zabory, and Zblewo)
Archdiocese of Gniezno (Wierzchucin Królewski and part of Fordon outside of Bydgoszcz)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (Bytów, Człuchów, Główczyce, Lębork, Łeba, and Łupawa)
Diocese of Pelplin (and Metropolitan from Gniezno)
25 March 1992Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (from Gniezno)
24 February 2004Territory LostArchdiocese of Gniezno (Bydgoszcz I, Bydgoszcz II, Bydgoszcz III, Bydgoszcz IV, Bydgoszcz V, Kcynia, Łobżenica, Mrocza, Nakło, Szubin, Wyrzysk, and Wysoka)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (Złotów)
Diocese of Pelplin (Part of Koronowo, Sępólno Krajeńskie, and Wierzchucin)
Diocese of Bydgoszcz (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1980929,000983,00094.5%2551083632,559116289183ap1981
1990967,2001,019,70094.9%3431164592,107124314229ap1991
1999850,000930,00091.4%3851195041,686130288220ap2000
2000849,500928,00091.5%3881185061,678128273223ap2001
2001850,000935,00090.9%3971255221,628131257223ap2002
2002850,000933,00091.1%4111115221,628119276226ap2003
2003890,000965,05092.2%4181195371,657126276227ap2004
2004890,000965,00092.2%4191185371,657125276227ap2005
2006910,900925,00098.5%4151125271,728119255217ap2007
2013833,058912,92991.3%4411245651,474131231220ap2014
2016833,058912,92991.3%4331305631,479135227220ap2017
2019811,430901,12090.0%4121245361,513129234221ap2020
2021820,960911,70090.0%4121295411,517135227221ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 657, to Page 659
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 1,099, to Page 1,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 7 Aug 2023