Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Bárd

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kalocsa

Titular Bishop of Ulpiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1908BornMérk
29 Jun 193324.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 195042.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 Nov 195042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
1 Apr 195142.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
196152.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
Oct 1961³53.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Jan 196455.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Kalocsa, Hungary
23 Sep 198274.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Bárd:
Bishop János Bárd (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013