Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Rogács

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1880Born
28 Jun 190322.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 194867.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
28 Apr 194867.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
29 Jun 194867.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
2 Mar 195877.5SucceededBishop of Pécs, Hungary
20 Feb 196180.5DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Rogács
Bishop Ferenc Rogács (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCsendlak

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast