Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Hryhory Lakota

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Daonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1883BornHolodivka
23 Aug 190825.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
30 Aug 190825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
10 Feb 192643.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
10 Feb 192643.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Daonium
16 May 192643.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daonium
12 Nov 195067.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Hryhory Lakota:
Bishop Bl. Hryhory Lakota (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,263
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 31
  • b/c0+/od/op: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015